Coleman v. Allen et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: John Stephen Coleman
Defendant: Richard Allen, Lewis Boyd, Kenneth Sconyers and Anthony Askews
Case Number: 2:2009cv00311
Filed: April 9, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: (1) the petitioner's 58 objection to the recommendation is overruled; (2) the 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Mag Judge is adopted; (3) granting 24 Motion for Summary Judgment; (4) the costs of this proceeding is taxed against the plaintiff, for which execution may issue. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 9/24/12. (djy, )
June 4, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the plaintiff's 48 Appeal Order on Motion Document 46-1 is OVERRULED; further directing this case is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate action. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 6/4/10. (scn, )
December 17, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that petitioner's 41 Objection is OVERRULED. Further Ordered that this case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate action. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 12/17/09. (sl, )
September 18, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling the Plaintiff's Objection 17 ; adopting 12 Report and Recommendation; denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction 1 ; referring case to Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 9/18/09. (br, )
June 24, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before 7/15/2009 Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' 23 Answer and 24 Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 6/24/2009. (dmn)
June 4, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 6/4/2009. (dmn)
May 22, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that: 1. The 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction be DENIED; and 2. This case be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 6/5/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 5/22/2009. (dmn)
April 14, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $3.50 be paid on or before 5/5/2009; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 4/14/2009. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Allen et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stephen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sconyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Askews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?