Blackburn v. Bowers (INMATE1)
Plaintiff: W. Mason Blackburn
Defendant: Robert L. Bowers, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00463
Filed: May 20, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER overruling plaintiff's 8 Objection; adopting 7 Report and Recommendations; dismissing this case with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 9/18/2009. (cc, )
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this case be dismissed with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). Objections to R&R due by 6/17/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 6/4/2009. (cc, )
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO 6 ORDER. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this case be dismissed with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); Objections to R&R due by 6/4/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 5/22/2009. (cc, ) Modified on 6/4/2009 (cc, ).
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Staton Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 5/21/2009. (cc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackburn v. Bowers (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. Mason Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Bowers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?