J.T. v. Monster Mountain, LLC et al

Plaintiff: J.T., Jr.
Defendant: Monster Mountain, LLC, Double AA Enterprises, LLC, Precision Cycles, LLC, William Andrews, III and Milan Harris
Case Number: 2:2009cv00643
Filed: July 9, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Upon consideration of the Plaintiff's Omnibus Motions in Limine 121 , it is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant show cause on or before June 8, 2012, why the motion should not be granted. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/1/2012. (jg, )
January 13, 2012 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: After a telephone conference with counsel, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion to Continue Trial 108 is GRANTED and trial of this case is continued from the February 6, 2012 trial term to the trial term beginning June 18, 2012. The case will be disposed of on or before June 18, one way or another. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/13/2012. (jg, ) TERMINATED: Jury Trial 02/06/2012
December 20, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 104 Motion for Reconsideration is hereby ORDERED DENIED as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/20/2011. (jg, )
December 9, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment is ORDERED DENIED. Signed by Honorable W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/9/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.T. v. Monster Mountain, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.T., Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monster Mountain, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double AA Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Cycles, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Andrews, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?