Smith v. Citibank (South Dakota), N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Ray Charles Smith
Defendant: Citibank (South Dakota), N.A., Capital One Bank (USA), Equifax Information Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00719
Filed: July 31, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Bullock
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that the 39 motion to dismiss with prejudice is granted and that defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and the claims against it are dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs, attorneys' fees, and ex penses. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 2/10/2010. term: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2010; Jury Trial set for 9/20/2010 (br, )
October 27, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that pursuant to the joint stipulation of dismissal 34 , it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC and the claims against it are dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to bear th eir own costs, attorneys' fees, and expenses. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 10/23/2009. (br, )
October 13, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court RULE 26(f) ORDER: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 10/30/2009. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 10/13/2009. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Citibank (South Dakota), N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Charles Smith
Represented By: Anthony B. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank (South Dakota), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?