Holloway v. United States of America (INMATE3)
Plaintiff: Tammy Holloway
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2009cv00760
Filed: August 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER as follows: (1) the 7 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted; (2) Ms. Holloway's Section 2255 petition is granted; (3) the judgment of conviction and sentence entered in case no. 2:08CR62 (Doc. 24 in that case) are vac ated; and (4) the Clerk of Court shall file, in case 2:08CR62 copies of this Amended Order and the accompanying Final Judgment along with the Magistrate Judge's 7 Recommendation. An appropriate judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 10/26/09. (sl, )
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED that: (1) the 7 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; (2) Ms. Holloway's Section 2255 motion is GRANTED; (3) the Judgment in a Criminal Case filed in case 2:08CR62-WKW (Doc. 26 in that case) is VACATED; (4) this matter is set for resentencing on 10/29/09 at 11:00 a.m.; and (5) Mr Timothy Charles Halstrom, Esq., is APPOINTED under the provisions of the Criminal Justice Act to represent Ms. Holloway at her resentencing. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 10/22/09. (sl, )
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that Holloway's motion to set aside, vacate, or correct sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 be granted; that the judgment in Holloway's criminal case, Case No. 2:08cr62-WKW, be vacated, and that Holloway's case be set for resentencing. Objections to R&R due by 10/5/2009. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/22/09. (sl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. United States of America (INMATE3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher A. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?