Santos v. Flemmings et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Nedolandez Leon Santos
Defendant: Danny Flemmings, J. C. Giles and M. Larry Monk
Case Number: 2:2009cv00787
Filed: August 20, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed with prejudice prior to service of process as further set out. Objections to R&R due by 12/15/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 12/1/09. (sl, )
November 23, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 21 Recommendation fo the Magistrate Judge entered on 10/15/2009 is VACATED. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 11/23/2009. (cb, )
October 15, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court (VACATED PER 21 ORDER) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED and that this case be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 10/28/2009. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 10/15/2009. (cb, ) Modified on 11/23/2009 to vacate order (cb, ).
October 8, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before 10/23/09, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on a form for use in filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint as further set out and that Plaintiff's 4 , 5 , 6 , 16 Motions to Amend are DENIED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to furnish Plaintiff with a form for use in filing a complaint under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. **1983 Complaint mailed along with order as directed. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 10/8/2009. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos v. Flemmings et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nedolandez Leon Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Flemmings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Larry Monk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?