Bender v. Baylor et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Tenneyson Bender
Defendant: A. D. Baylor, Todd Strange, Levan Thomas and Randy Conlotakis
Case Number: 2:2009cv00789
Filed: August 20, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that: (1.) Defendants Baylor, Thomas, and Goniotakis's motions for summary judgment (docs. # 20 , 23 , 28 & 30 ) be and are hereby GRANTED and these defendants be and are hereby DISMISSED as defendants in this action; (2.) Defendants Ezell, Gibson and Gorum's 39 motion for summary judgment regarding Bender's excessive force claim against them in their individual capacities be and is hereby DENIED; (3.) This case be and is hereby set fo r a scheduling conference on the plaintiff's surviving excessive force claims against Defendants Ezell, Gibson and Gorum on June 12, 2012, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4B, United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; and (4.) The plaintiff's 55 motion for status be and is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/22/12. (Furnished to Calendar/WS)(scn, )
December 3, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 17 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; GRANTING the Plaintiff's 12 Motion to Dismiss Mayor Todd Strange; DISMISSING Mayor Todd Strange as a defendant in this cause of action; REFERRING this case back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 12/3/09. (br, )
October 29, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that: 1) Plaintiff's October 7, 2009 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Mayor Todd Strange 12 , be GRANTED; 2) Defendant Todd Strange be DISMISSED with prejudice as a party to this complaint; and, 3) This case with respect to the remaining defendants be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 11/11/2009. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 10/29/2009. (br, )
September 23, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before October 8, 2009 Plaintiff shall amend his complaint to provide additional factual information as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 9/23/09. (br, )
August 28, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $302.92 be paid on or before 9/18/2009; directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 3 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Draper Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 8/28/09. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bender v. Baylor et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenneyson Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. D. Baylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Conlotakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?