Moore v. Holt (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: James Edward Moore
Defendant: Kathy Holt
Case Number: 2:2009cv00844
Filed: September 3, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and OPINION that it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Mag Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that: (1) the defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; (2) judgment is GRANTED in favor of the defendant; (3) this case is dismissed with prejudice; (4) the costs of this proceeding are taxed against the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 8/30/12. (djy, )
September 29, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/29/2009. (wcl, )
September 8, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Upon review of the 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by James Edward Moore, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that on or before 9/28/2009 the plaintiff shall file an amendment to the complaint in which he specifically describes how defendant Holt acted in violation of his constitutional rights. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/8/2009. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Holt (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?