Steele v. McKathan et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Jimmie Steele
Defendant: Ashley McKathan and Lex Short
Case Number: 2:2009cv00854
Filed: September 8, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Covington
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION; ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 4 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that plf's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process under the provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (iii). Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 10/16/2009. (wcl, )
September 24, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that Plf's complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process under the provisions of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (iii); Objections to R&R due by 10/7/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/24/2009. (wcl, )
September 11, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Covington County Jail. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 9/11/2009. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele v. McKathan et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley McKathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lex Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?