Braswell Wood Company, Incorporated v. Waste Away Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Braswell Wood Company, Incorporated
Defendant: Waste Away Group, Inc., Waste Management, Inc. and Waste Management of Tennessee, Alabama and Kentucky
Case Number: 2:2009cv00891
Filed: September 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Bullock
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that Plaintiff's 67 Renewed Motion to Remand is DENIED; Defendants shall inform the court on or before June 22, 2011, by notice or motion, if this Order renders moot their pending 76 Motion for Entry of Partial Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b). Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/9/11. (scn, )
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that, upon reconsideration, and finding no error in its prior Order, it is ORDERED that that Plaintiff's 48 Motion for Reconsideration and 49 Motion for hearing and oral argument are DENIED. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 1/26/11. (scn, )
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that the 21 Motion to Dismiss Count II is GRANTED, and the 21 alternative motion for a more definitive statement is DENIED as moot; it is further ORDERED that WM's 23 Motion to take notice of certain government documents is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 8/10/10. (scn, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braswell Wood Company, Incorporated v. Waste Away Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braswell Wood Company, Incorporated
Represented By: James Michael Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Away Group, Inc.
Represented By: Larry Shane Seaborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Management, Inc.
Represented By: Larry Shane Seaborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Management of Tennessee, Alabama and Kentucky
Represented By: Larry Shane Seaborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?