Sellers v. Cross et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Brian Sellers
Defendant: Mark Cross and Lamar Walker
Case Number: 2:2009cv00999
Filed: October 29, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: O Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: O
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants. The clerk of the court is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 3/11/2010. (br, )
February 17, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to comply with the directives of the court's order. Objections to R&R due by 3/2/2010. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/17/2010. (br, )
November 3, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $23.00 be paid on or before November 24, 2009; directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Ventress Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/3/09. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sellers v. Cross et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Cross
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar Walker
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?