Taylor v. Franklin et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: John William Taylor
Defendant: William Emmett Franklin, Sgt. Fox and Sue Roberts
Case Number: 2:2010cv00006
Filed: January 4, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 10 is hereby ADOPTED; that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failures to comply with the orders of the court and to prosecute this action. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 5/25/2010. (jg, )
January 14, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Plaintiff's claims that he has been denied access to television and radio and that Defendants are improperly taxing postage-paid envelopes be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the directi ves of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that Plaintiff's claim that he is being denied access to the courts be DISMISSED prior to service of process pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); that this case with respect to Plaintiff's claim that his First Amendment rights are being violated by a denial of access to newspapers and magazines be referred back to the undersigned for further proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 1/28/2010. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 1/14/2010. (jg, )
January 8, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk Elmore County Jail. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 1/8/2010. (cb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Franklin et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John William Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Emmett Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?