Blanton v. Easterling Correctional Facility et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Jonathan A. Blanton, Sr.
Defendant: Officer Campbell, Officer Bell, Kenneth Drake and Carter F. Davenport
Case Number: 2:2010cv00031
Filed: January 12, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
0 Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, after an independent and de novo review of the record, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) the 26 Magistrate judge's recommendation, to which no objection has been filed, is adopted; (2) Plai ntiff Jonathan A. Blanton, Sr.'s 24 motion for preliminary injunction is denied; further ORDERED that this cause is referred back to the magistrate judge for further appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 1/11/11. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (scn, )
October 6, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that (1) The 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by the plaintiff be DENIED; (2) This case be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings; further ORDERED that on or before October 20, 2010 the parties may file objections to the Recommendation. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 10/6/10. (scn, )
January 13, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the plaintiff's claims against the Easterling Correctional Facility be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that the Easterling Correctional Facility be dismiss ed as a defendant in this cause of action; that the plaintiffs allegations of threatening and derogatory language be dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); that this case, with respect to the equal protection, due process and use of forceclaims lodged against defendants Davenport, Drake, Campbell and Bell, be referred back to the undersigned for appropriate proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 1/28/2010. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 1/13/2010. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanton v. Easterling Correctional Facility et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Campbell
Represented By: Bettie J. Carmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bell
Represented By: Bettie J. Carmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Drake
Represented By: Bettie J. Carmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter F. Davenport
Represented By: Bettie J. Carmack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan A. Blanton, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?