Lemieux v. Keller (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: David M. Lemieux
Defendant: J. A. Keller
Case Number: 2:2010cv00040
Filed: January 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the 19 RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED, and Petitioner's 28 U.S.C. § 2241 1 Petition for Habeas Corpus Relief is DISMISSED as moot. A separate judgment shall issue. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 12/20/2011. (dmn, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER withdrawing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE in light of the petitioner's timely payment of the filing fee in this case. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/24/2010. (br, )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WITHDRAWN pursuant to 5 Order: RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice for Petitioner's failure to comply with the order of this court. Objections to R&R due by 3/3/2010. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/18/2010. (br, ) Modified on 2/24/2010 (br, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemieux v. Keller (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Lemieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. A. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?