Fisher v. City of Montgomery et al

Plaintiff: Wiley Fisher
Defendant: City of Montgomery, Montgomery Police Department, Dan Stallworth, Antonio Loria and Jeremy K. Peterson
Case Number: 2:2010cv00189
Filed: March 3, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Butler
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the defendants to respond to the 34 MOTION to Alter Judgment by 3/25/2011. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 3/18/2011. (br, )
February 17, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Defendants' 20 Motion for Summary Judgment, as further set out. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 2/17/11. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (scn, )
November 5, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion for Leave to File an amended answer outside of the time allotted by the scheduling order. Signed by Honorable William Keith Watkins on 11/5/2010. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. City of Montgomery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wiley Fisher
Represented By: Michael Guy Holton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Stallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Loria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy K. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?