Whitley v. Albright et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Gale Acreman Whitley
Defendant: Frank Albright, Tutwiler Prison and Alabama Dept. of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2010cv00315
Filed: April 13, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 46 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Mag Judge and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 6/7/12. (djy, )
May 3, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the plf shall file an amended complaint on a form for use in filing a 42 USC 1983 complaint, as further set out in order; Amended Pleadings due by 5/18/2010; directing the clerk to furnish plf with a formfor use in filing a complaint under 42 USC 1983 to assist her in coing with the directives contained herein. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/3/10. Mailed with complaint form, as directed.(djy, )
April 14, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $35.53 be paid on or before 5/5/10 ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Tutwiler Prison. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/14/10. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitley v. Albright et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gale Acreman Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tutwiler Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?