Taylor v. Allen et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Jimye Taylor
Defendant: Richard F. Allen, Kenneth Jones and Steven Walker
Case Number: 2:2010cv00383
Filed: May 4, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Bullock
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 1. The Recommendation 86 of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2. The defendants' motions for summary judgment are GRANTED; 3. Judgment is GRANTED in favor of the defendants; 4. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice; and 5. The costs of this proceeding are taxed against the plaintiff. A separate judgment shall issue. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 9/27/2013. (jg, )
May 31, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: 1. The Recommendation 46 of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2. Plaintiff's motion to dismiss is GRANTED; 3. The claims against Richard Allen are dismissed with prejudice; 4. Richard Allen is dismissed as a party to this cause of action; and 5. This case, with respect to Plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants, is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 5/31/2012. (jg, )
September 21, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; 1. The plaintiff's objection 12 to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge filed on June 1, 2010 is overruled; 2. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 9 filed on May 17, 2010 is adopted; 3. The motion for preliminary injunction filed by the plaintiff is DENIED. 4. The case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 9/21/2010. (jg, )
May 6, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing monthly payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at Bullock Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/6/2010. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Allen et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimye Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard F. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?