Larkin v. King et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Adam Paul Larkin
Defendant: Troy King, Richard F. Allen and John Cummins
Case Number: 2:2010cv00460
Filed: May 25, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 17 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; dismissing this cause without prejudice for failure to prosecute the action. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/20/2010. (br, )
July 2, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 12 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE; denying the 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; referring this case back to the Magistrate Judge for further appropriate proceedings. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 7/2/2010. (br, )
May 26, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $18.00 be paid on or before 6/15/2010; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Kilby Correctional. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/26/2010. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larkin v. King et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Paul Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard F. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?