Hardin v. City of Troy Public Work Dept et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Samuel Hardin
Defendant: City of Troy Public Work Dept, Mr. May, Mr. Von and Mr. Ned
Case Number: 2:2010cv00663
Filed: August 3, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Coffee
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 29 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED, and that Dfts' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/16/2013. (wcl, )
November 2, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that on or before November 22, 2010 the plaintiff shall file a response to the written report filed by the defendants as further set out. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 11/2/2010. (jg, )
August 5, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Directing Monthly Payments of 20 percent of each preceding month be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and inmate account clerk at Elba Work Release Center. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 8/5/2010. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardin v. City of Troy Public Work Dept et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Troy Public Work Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Von
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Ned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?