Adams v. The City of Montgomery - Maintenance Department

Plaintiff: Willie Adams
Defendant: The City of Montgomery - Maintenance Department
Case Number: 2:2010cv00924
Filed: October 29, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2014 236 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that defendant City of Montgomery's motion for attorney's fees (doc. no. 221 ) is denied, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/4/14. (scn, ) Modified on 3/4/2014 to correct signature date in docket text (scn, ).
November 18, 2013 235 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing that plaintiff Willie Adams's motion for attorney's fees (Doc. No. 120 ) is granted and that attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $ 20,406.20 are awarded to plaintiff Adams from defendant City of Montgomery. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/18/13. (scn, )
February 14, 2013 209 Opinion or Order of the Court Court's Instructions to the Jury. (ag, )
January 2, 2013 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that counsel for all parties are to do the following: (1) Meet, in person, by no later than 1/8/2013, to attempt to resolve the 194 Motion in Limine and 193 Objection; and (2) File a jointly prepared report by 1/10/2013 (a) as to which issues in the motion and objection are resolved and which ones remain unresolved and (b), for each and every unresolved issue, setting forth in detail the position of each side. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/2/2013. (wcl, )
June 6, 2012 124 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 118 MOTION to Reconsider, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/6/2012. (wcl, )
May 29, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING def City of Montgomery's 103 MOTION to Strike Walter Lilley's deposition transcript from another suit and its objection to the same is overruled, because the court did not rely on it in issuing its opinion and order on the work-product doctrine. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/29/12. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. The City of Montgomery - Maintenance Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Adams
Represented By: Larry Ray Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Montgomery - Maintenance Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?