Chappell v. Waller et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Michael T. Chappell
Defendant: Greg Waller, OBGYN and Associates, Paige Mitchell, Gift of Life and Cindy Pierce
Case Number: 2:2010cv01022
Filed: December 2, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 8 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(I). Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 1/6/2011. (dmn)
December 15, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); Objections to R&R due by 12/29/2010. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 12/15/2010. (cc, )
December 14, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 5 Motion to Appoint Public Defender is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 12/14/2010. (dmn)
December 6, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Montgomery City Jail. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 12/6/2010. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chappell v. Waller et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T. Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OBGYN and Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paige Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gift of Life
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?