Watkins v. The City of Montgomery

Plaintiff: Roosevelt Watkins
Defendant: The City of Montgomery
Case Number: 2:2011cv00158
Filed: March 7, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Autauga
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:0207
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2013 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Plfs' 99 Motion in Limine and Plfs' 100 Motion to Exclude Witnesses from Trial are DENIED as moot; further ORDERED that Dft's 111 Motion in Limine is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/19/2013. (wcl, )
February 20, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that counsel for the named plaintiff, Roosevelt Watkins, and the defendant, City of Montgomery, must inform the Court of whether the named plaintiff and the defendant give their consent to the video recording and whether there are any limitations on that consent by completing and filing with the Court the form appended hereto no later than 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, February 21, 2013, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/20/13. (scn, )
February 14, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Upon consideration of the arguments made by counsel during the 1/29/2013 telephonic status conference, it is hereby ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiffs' 87 Motion to Strike Trial Witnesses is DENIED; and (2) Plaintiff's 88 Motion to Require Defendant to Bear the Cost of Producing Its "Payroll Records" is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/14/2013. (dmn, )
February 5, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PRETRIAL HEARING directing that: (1) The jury selection and trial of this cause, which is to last (4) days, are set for February 25, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. at the United States Courthouse in Montgomery Alabama; (2) A trial docket will be mailed to counsel for each party approximately three (3) weeks prior to the start of the trial term; (3) The parties are to file their pre-trial briefs, if any, by February 18, 2013; (4) Each party shall have available at the time of trial, for use by the court (the Judge, the courtroom deputy clerk, and the law clerk), three (3) copies of the Exhibit List and a sufficient number of copies of each photostatically reproducible exhibit for opposing counsel, the courtroom deputy clerk, the law clerk, and the Judge to each have a set of the exhibits; (5) All deadlines not otherwise affected by this order will remain as set forth in the 41 Amended Uniform Scheduling Order; (6) All understandings, agreements, deadlines, and stipulations contained in this Pretrial Order shall be binding on all parties unless this Order be hereafter modified by Order of the Court; (7) Trial in this case shall be bifurcated between the issues of liability and damages, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/5/13. (Furnished to Calendar/WR)(scn, )
January 19, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that: (1) Plf's 47 Motion to Facilitate Class Notice Pursuant to 29 USC § 216(b) is GRANTED and this matter is CONDITIONALLY CERTIFIED as a collective action pursuant to 29 USC §216(b); (2) Dft, the City of Montgomery, IDENTI FY TO PLF all current and former Fire Suppression Lieutenants who have worked for the Montgomery Fire Department in that capacity since 2/22/2005; (3) The Proposed "Notice of Lawsuit and Consent To Become A Party Plf" (Doc. # 48 , Ex A) is APPROVED with the requirement that, on page two, section III, line six, the word "were" be removed where it appears before the word "worked;" and (4) Plf is AUTHORIZED to issue notice of this lawsuit to all present and former Fire Suppression Lieutenants who have worked for the City of Montgomery in that capacity at any time between 2/22/2005 and the present. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/19/2012. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. The City of Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Watkins
Represented By: Walter Lee Gresham, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Montgomery
Represented By: Wallace Damon Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?