McKenzie v. Boyd et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Tracy McKenzie
Defendant: Louis Boyd, Alabama Department of Corrections, Correctional Medical Service, Dr. Darbouze and Nurse Wilson
Case Number: 2:2011cv00259
Filed: April 7, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION: it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 31 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for plf's failures to prosecute this action properly and to comply with the orders of this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 8/7/2013. (wcl, )
September 6, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/6/2011. (br, )
June 28, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file a response to the 11 21 answers and written reports on or before July 19, 2011. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/28/2011. (br, )
June 1, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION: It Is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 8 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED and that: 1. Plaintiff's claims against the Alabama Department of Corrections is DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process un der 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(I); 2. The Alabama Department of Corrections is DISMISSED as a party to this cause of action; and 3. This case with respect to plaintiffs claims against the remaining defendants is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 6/1/2011. (dmn)
April 11, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 4/11/2011. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenzie v. Boyd et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Darbouze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?