Buckner v. Allen et al (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Randy Scott Buckner
Defendant: Anthony Askew, Gwendolyn C Mosley, Louis Boyd, Kenneth Sconyers, Gwendolyn Babers, Steven Walker and Richard Allen
Case Number: 2:2011cv00393
Filed: May 24, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: 1) The 64 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2) The dfts' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and judgment is GRANTED in favor of the dfts; 3) Plf's federal claims are DISMISSED with prejudice; 4) Plf's state-law claims are DISMISSED without prejudice; 5) The costs of this proceeding are taxed against the plf. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/24/2014. (wcl, )
November 7, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: 1. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. 2. The motion for preliminary injunction filed by the plaintiff is DENIED. 3. This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/7/2011. (jg, )
May 25, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION ON MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $13.30 be paid on or before June 13, 2011; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; the clerk is DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this order to the account clerk at the Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/25/2011. (jg, ) copy mailed to account clerk at Easterling Correctional Facility as directed in order.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckner v. Allen et al (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Askew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn C Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sconyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Babers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Scott Buckner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?