Boyd v. Koch Foods of Alabama, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tina Boyd
Defendant: Koch Foods of Alabama, LLC, David Birchfield and Koch Foods, Inc.
Movant: Tarsha Hunter
Case Number: 2:2011cv00748
Filed: September 12, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2013 364 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing that the defendants Koch Foods of Alabama, LLC, David Birchfield, and Koch Foods, Inc.'s motions for summary judgment (doc. nos. 127 , 130 , 133 , 134 , and 155 ) are granted as to plaintiff Tina Boyd's pay -discrimination claim under § 1981 and plaintiff Tarsha Hunter's retaliation claim under Title VII, and these claims shall not go forward; these motions have now been resolved in all respects; this case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/20/13. (scn, )
September 18, 2013 362 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 346 , 347 , 350 , 355 , and 360 MOTIONS in Limine and 351 and 359 Objections; ORDERED that counsel for all parties are to do the following: (1) Meet, in person, by no later than 9/24/2013, to attempt to resolve the motions and objections; and (2) File a jointly prepared report by 9/26/2013, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/18/2013. (wcl, )
February 6, 2013 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) The 148 , 150 , and 151 motions to dismiss and the 127 , 130 , 133 , 134 , and 155 motions for summary judgment are granted as to the plaintiffs' claims under RICO based on 8 U.S.C. § 1324(a)(1)(A)( iv); (2) The 148 , 150 , and 151 motions to dismiss are denied as to the plaintiffs' claims under RICO based on 8 U.S.C. § 1324(a)(1)(A)(iii) and § 1324(a)(1)(A)(v)(I)-(II); (3) The 148 , 150 , and 151 motions to dismiss are denied in all other respects as well; (4) The 127 , 130 , 133 , 134 , and 155 motions for summary judgment in all other respects are still pending. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/6/13. (scn, )
January 10, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Tarsha Hunter's motion to intervene 47 is granted pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b)(1)(B). Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/10/2012. (jg, )
December 8, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting the plaintiff's oral motion to extend the time for service of process until November 21, 2011. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/8/2011. (br, )
November 21, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to show cause as to whether there is "good cause" under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) to extend the service-of-process deadline, and why the 38 Motion to Dismiss should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 11/28/2011. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/21/2011. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Koch Foods of Alabama, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Boyd
Represented By: Alicia Kay Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Foods of Alabama, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Ellen VanNortwick
Represented By: Wesley Clyde Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Birchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Tarsha Hunter
Represented By: Barry V Frederick
Represented By: Brandi Branton Frederick
Represented By: Heather Newsom Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?