Golston v. Enfinger, et al. (INMATE1)

Plaintiff: Anthony Golston
Defendant: Gary Hetzel, Kenneth Sconyers, Gwendolyn Babers, Kerry Williams and Matthew Enfinger
Case Number: 2:2011cv00946
Filed: November 3, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
0 Judge: W. Harold Albritton
1 Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) The 44 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, to which no objection has been filed, is adopted. (2) The defendants' 14 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in pa rt and denied in part. (3) Summary judgment is granted as to (a) plaintiff Anthony Golstons request for monetary damages from the defendants in their official capacities on all claims; and as to (b) all plaintiff Golstons claims against the defendant s except for his excessive-force and failure-to-protect claims against defendants Matthew Enfinger and Kerry Williams. (4) Summary judgment is denied in all remaining respects as to plaintiff Golston's excessive-force and failure-to-protect clai ms against defendants Enfingerand Williams. (5) All defendants except Enfinger and Williams are terminated as parties. (6) This case is referred back to the magistrate judge for an evidentiary hearing on the surviving aspects of this case. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgmentpursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is not closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/23/2015. (dmn, )
June 24, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) Plaintiff's 34 objections are overruled; (2) The United States Magistrate Judge's 29 recommendation is adopted; (3) Plaintiff's 19 motion for preliminary injunction is denied; (4) This cause is referred back to the United States Magistrate Judge for further appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/24/13. (scn, )
November 8, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Easterling CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/8/2011. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golston v. Enfinger, et al. (INMATE1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Golston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sconyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Babers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Enfinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?