Abrams et al v. Tuberville et al

Plaintiff: John A. Abrams, Priscilla W. Abrams, Debra Clark, Baron J. Lowe, Melanie D. Lowe, Fredrick Glen Williams, Kristy A. Williams and Flynn R. Dubose, Jr.
Defendant: Thomas H. Tuberville, John David Stroud, TS Capital Partners, TS Capital Partners, LLC, TS Capital Management, LLC, TS Capital Fund, L.P. and TS Capital GP, LLC
Movant: Charles C. Goldberg
Case Number: 2:2012cv00177
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2013 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the judgment 221 is amended to reflect that this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/12/2013. (jg, )
October 3, 2013 188 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 54(b): that the claims in Counts 3, 4, 5, 7, 12, 15, 16, 17 of the Second Amended Complaint and the wantonness or wanton supervision claims in Counts 13 and 14 of the Second Amended Complaint against Thomas H. Tuberville ("Tuberville") only are DISMISSED with prejudice as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/3/2013. (jg, )
July 8, 2013 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the pretrial is reset for September 6, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. in Montgomery Alabama, and that the jury selection and trial are reset for October 15, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. in Montgomery Alabama as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/8/2013. (jg, ) TERMINATED: Final Pretrial Conference 07/11/2013; Jury Trial 08/05/2013

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams et al v. Tuberville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Abrams
Represented By: Henry Hamilton Hutchinson
Represented By: Robert Turner Meadows, III
Represented By: Barbara Jean Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla W. Abrams
Represented By: Henry Hamilton Hutchinson
Represented By: Robert Turner Meadows, III
Represented By: Barbara Jean Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Clark
Represented By: Henry Hamilton Hutchinson
Represented By: Robert Turner Meadows, III
Represented By: Barbara Jean Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baron J. Lowe
Represented By: Henry Hamilton Hutchinson
Represented By: Robert Turner Meadows, III
Represented By: Barbara Jean Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie D. Lowe
Represented By: Henry Hamilton Hutchinson
Represented By: Robert Turner Meadows, III
Represented By: Barbara Jean Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Glen Williams
Represented By: Henry Hamilton Hutchinson
Represented By: Robert Turner Meadows, III
Represented By: Barbara Jean Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy A. Williams
Represented By: Henry Hamilton Hutchinson
Represented By: Robert Turner Meadows, III
Represented By: Barbara Jean Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flynn R. Dubose, Jr.
Represented By: Henry Hamilton Hutchinson
Represented By: Robert Turner Meadows, III
Represented By: Barbara Jean Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas H. Tuberville
Represented By: S. Greg Burge
Represented By: Benjamin Brock Coulter
Represented By: Devin Clarke Dolive
Represented By: Victor Lee Hayslip
Represented By: Robert Howard Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John David Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TS Capital Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TS Capital Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TS Capital Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TS Capital Fund, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TS Capital GP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Charles C. Goldberg
Represented By: Reid C Carpenter
Represented By: John Banks Sewell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?