Hooks v. The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Kristy Hooks
Defendant: The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv00220
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the 18 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/16/12. (scn, )
November 2, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the defendant as to why 18 Motion for Reconsideration should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 11/13/2012, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/2/12. (djy, )
October 19, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that Plaintiff's 13 Motion to Remand to Claims Administrator is DENIED, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 10/19/12. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooks v. The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Hooks
Represented By: Gregory Jack McKay
Represented By: Peter Harrington Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Tiffany Threlkeld Leonard
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Represented By: William Bernhart Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?