Webb v. Wilkins et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Ricky Lee Webb, Jr.
Defendant: Gary Hetzel, C/O Wilkins and Sgt. Williams
Case Number: 2:2012cv00559
Filed: June 28, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: 1) The 35 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2) Plf's 34 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/21/2012. (wcl, )
September 28, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon an independent review of the file in this case and upon consideration of the 25 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that: (1) The 21 motion for preliminary injunction filed by the plaintiff is DENIED; (2) This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/28/12. (scn, )
August 27, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order 21 is DENIED; that the Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 21 is REFERRED to the assigned Magistrate Judge for action or recommendation on all pretrial matters. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/27/2012. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Wilkins et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hetzel
Represented By: Billington Malone Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Wilkins
Represented By: Billington Malone Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Williams
Represented By: Billington Malone Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Lee Webb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?