Billups v. Astrue (CONSENT)

Plaintiff: Jason Billups
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00815
Filed: September 20, 2012
 
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER denying 3 Motion for Leave to File evidence. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/7/13. (djy, )
January 9, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER VACATING this Court's 15 order; ORDERING that the parties shall file briefs, as further set out in order; directing that plaintiff shall file his brief on or before 1/18/2013 and defendant shall file his brief on or before 1/30/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/9/13. (djy, )
May 7, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER that the Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief 24 be and hereby is GRANTED and that on or before May 22, 2012, Plaintiff shall file his Reply Brief. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 5/7/2013. (jg, )
December 27, 2013 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that the decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/27/13. (djy, )
December 27, 2013 28 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT, in accordance with the prior proceedings, opinions, and orders of the court, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED; Judgment is entered in favor of the Defendant Commissioner and against the Plaintiff Jason O. Billups and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/27/13. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Billups v. Astrue (CONSENT)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Billups
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Robert Randolph Neeley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]