Kenner v. Hetzel et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Bradley Kenner
Defendant: Phelix Woods, Gary Hetzel, Kenneth Sconyers, Gwendolyn Mosely and James Deloach
Case Number: 2:2012cv00938
Filed: October 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: 1) The 26 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2) This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/7/2013. (wcl, )
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: 1) The 4 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2) The 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by plf is DENIED and this case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/27/2012. (wcl, )
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying 1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; further ORDERED that this case is hereby REFERRED to US Magistrate Judge Terry F. Moorer for action or recommendation on all pretrial matters. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/29/2012. (wcl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenner v. Hetzel et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phelix Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sconyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Mosely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Deloach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Kenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?