Cardinal Health 200 LLC v. The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health

Plaintiff: Cardinal Health 200 LLC
Defendant: The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health
Case Number: 2:2012cv00988
Filed: November 7, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the status conference hearing is CONTINUED until March 20, 2013, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2A, United States Courthouse, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; that the parties file a joint report regarding the status of their settlement negotiations on or before March 7, 2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/21/2013. (jg, )
February 20, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the 18 Joint Motion to Continue Status Conference is GRANTED to the extent it requests a new hearing date; the hearing originally scheduled for February 21, 2013, at 10:00 a.m., is hereby CANCELED and will be rescheduled for a later date. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/20/13. (Furnished to Calendar/WR)(scn, )
February 7, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that Plaintiff's 16 Motion to Set Status Conference is GRANTED; further ORDERED that a hearing will be held in this matter on February 21, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2A, United States Courthouse, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; the parties and counsel are ORDERED to appear at said hearing. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/7/13. (Furnished to Calendar/WR)(scn, )
December 21, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Continue 10 is GRANTED; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/11/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/21/2012. (jg, )
November 8, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion to File Unredacted Complaint Under Seal, with leave to refile its motion with specific arguments and supporting legal precedent as to why the complaint should be placed under seal. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/8/2012. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardinal Health 200 LLC v. The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cardinal Health 200 LLC
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?