Morris v. Trust Company of Virginia et al
Plaintiff: |
Thomas Morris |
Defendant: |
Trust Company of Virginia, George Mason University Foundation, Inc. and Karen Loulakis |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv01020 |
Filed: |
November 20, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Montgomery Office |
County: |
Montgomery |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan Russ Walker |
Presiding Judge: |
William Keith Watkins |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 31, 2015 |
Filing
98
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that: (1) Full faith and credit is GRANTED to the order and decree of the Circuit Court of Virginia Beach, Virginia, adjudging the 1998 Will of Amy Falcon Morris to be her last will and testament and recognizing Karen Lou lakis as executrix of Amy's Estate; (2) Full faith and credit is GRANTED to the monetary judgments of the Circuit Court of Virginia Beach, Virginia, entered against Thomas Morris and Sharon Duncan, jointly and severally, and in favor of Amy Falc on Morris ($1,125,222) and George Mason University Foundation, Inc. ($100,000); (3) Full faith and credit is DENIED to the order and decree of the Probate Court of Montgomery County, Alabama, adjudging the 2007 Will of Amy Falcon Morris to be her last will and testament and appointing Thomas W. Morris, as personal representative of Amy's Estate; (4) The Trust Company's and the Foundation's motions to dismiss Mr. Morris's amended complaint in the lead case (Lead Case Docs. # 34 , 37 ) are GRANTED for all of the reasons set out in this opinion; (5) The Foundation's cross motion for summary judgment in the member case (Member Case Doc. # 51) is GRANTED; and (6) Mr. Morris and Ms. Duncan's cross motions for summary judgment in the member case (Member Case Docs. # 48, 60) are DENIED; further ORDERED that the Foundation is DIRECTED to file, on or before 4/7/2015, a current calculation of principal and interest owed by Mr. Morris and Ms. Duncan on the unpaid Virginia judgments; An appropriate final judgment will be entered separately. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/31/2015. (wcl, )
|
May 17, 2013 |
Filing
28
ORDER directing that the motions to dismiss (Docs. # 8 , 9 ) are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: (1) With regard to the claims Mr. Morris brings on his own behalf and on his mother's behalf, the motions are GRANTED, and those cl aims are DISMISSED with prejudice; (2) With regard to any claims Mr. Morris brings on behalf of his mother's estate that arose after she died, the motions are DENIED; further ORDERED that the complaint is STRICKEN with leave to replead on or before May 27, 2013, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/17/13. (scn, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?