Castleberry v. Colvin(CONSENT)
Plaintiff: Derek M. Castleberry
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2013cv00411
Filed: June 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), the petition for attorneys fees (doc. # 25 ) be and is hereby GRANTED, and the Commissioner shall pay to the plaintiff's attorney $11, 749.50 of the amount previously withheld from the plaintiff's past due benefits. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs counsel refund to the plaintiff the amount of $4,232.00 in fees previously awarded under the Equal Access to Justice Act. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/6/2016. (kh, )
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that the 19 Motion for attorneys fees be and is herebyGRANTED to the extent that the plaintiff be and is hereby AWARDED fees in the amount of $4,232.00 as further set out in the order. 2. To the extent that plaintiffs counsel requests t hat fees be awarded directly to counsel, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d)(1)(A) authorizes the court to award fees to the prevailing party.1 See 28 U.S.C. § (d)(2)(B). The motion that fees be paid directly to counsel be and is hereby DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/7/2014. (dmn, )
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that this case will be reversed and remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. It is further ORDERED that, in accordance with Bergen v. Commr of Soc. Sec., 454 F.3d 1273, 1278 fn. 2 (11th Cir. 2006), the plaintiff shall have sixty (60) days after he receives notice of any amount of past due benefits awarded to seek attorneys fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). See also Blitch v. Astrue, 261 Fed. Appx. 241, 242 fn.1 (11th Cir. 2008). A separate final judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/30/2014. (dmn, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castleberry v. Colvin(CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek M. Castleberry
Represented By: Jim C Pino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Robert Randolph Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?