Turner v. Allstate Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Garnet Turner
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv00685
Filed: September 23, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2017 217 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 153 MOTION to Compel the redeposition of Jim DeVries, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/24/17. (djy, )
February 14, 2017 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING parties' 181 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines for Expert disclosures; further ORDERING that Sections 2 and 8 of the 149 uniform scheduling order, as amended 172 , are amended as follows: SECTION 2: Dispositive Mot ions. Dispositive motions, e.g., motions for summary judgment, shall be filed no later than September 20, 2017. A brief and all supporting evidence shall be filed with any such motion. In all briefs filed by any party relating to the motion, the di scussion of the evidence in the brief must be accompanied by a specific reference, by page and line, to where the evidence can be found in a supporting deposition or document. Failure to make such specific reference may result in the evidence not be ing considered by the court. Daubert motions shall be filed on or before June 19, 2017, unless the deadline is modified by the court upon motion of a party demonstrating good cause; SECTION 8: Expert Witness Disclosures. The parties shall disclose t o each other the identity of ANY person who may be used at trial to present evidence under Rules 701, 702, 703, or 705 of the Federal Rules of Evidence, and provide the reports of retained experts or witnesses whose duties as an employee of the party regularly involved giving expert testimony, as required by Rule 26(a)(2)(A), (B), and (C) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as follows: from the plaintiff(s), on or before April 19, 2017, and from the defendant(s), on or before April 19, 2017 . Expert rebuttal reports within the meaning of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(D), i.e., expert reports that solely contradict or rebut evidence on the same subject matter identified by an opposing partys expert disclosure under Rule 26(a)(2)(B) or (C), shall be disclosed no later than May 19, 2017. The parties shall comply fully with all requirements of Rule 26(a)(2) in regard to disclosure of expert testimony. Unless an objection is filed within 14 days after disclosure of any expert witness, the disclosure shall be deemed to be in full compliance with the Rule; All other provisions of the Uniform Scheduling Order ( 149 , as amended 172 , remain in full force and effect. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/14/17. (djy, )
December 7, 2016 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 129 MOTION to Quash as to the following information: (1) Current employees of Allstate or former Allstate employees who retired before 1990 or after 2014; (2) documents which Allstate finds constitute work product after conducti ng a privilege review as specified in this order; and (3) personally identifying information about members of the putative classes; further ORDERING that (1) on or before 1/17/17, Allstate shall conduct a further privilege review of the documents pro duced to the court in camera and a privilege review of any other documents which Minnesota Life will produce in response to the subpoena, and (2) on or before 1/23/17, Allstate shall serve on the plaintiffs a privilege log in accordance with FED. R. CIV. P. 26(b)(5)(A); further ORDERING that in all other respects the motion to quash is DENIED and that on 1/17/2017, Minnesota Life may response to the subpoena in accordance with this order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/7/16. (djy, )
December 6, 2016 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the Turner plfs' 105 MOTION to Clarify is DENIED as moot; this case is no longer stayed; the parties shall proceed in accordance with the 149 uniform scheduling order; directing the clerk to lift the stay on the docket sheet. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/6/16. (djy, )
December 2, 2016 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 107 Motion for Sanctions without prejudice and with leave to refile the motion within 14 days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/2/16. (djy, )
September 23, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Plaintiffs are granted leave to and including 9/30/2014, to file a Second Amended Complaint to plead Count II with particularity. It is further ORDERED that Allstate's 23 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED with leave to refile at the appropriate time, and Allstate's 42 Motion for Leave to File Instanter a Response to Plaintiff's Notice and Suggestion of Recently Decided Case Law is DENIED as moot as further set out in the opinion and order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/23/2014. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garnet Turner
Represented By: Taylor Christopher Bartlett
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Boyce Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: David James Middlebrooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?