Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development v. Target Stores, Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff: Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development
Defendant: Target Stores, Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv00817
Filed: November 6, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2016 91 Per Curiam Opinion received from USCA Eleventh Circuit of Opinion Entered on 11th Circuit Appeal No. 15-10880-BB; Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions. (ydw, )
July 17, 2015 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Alabama certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: 77 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 15-10880-B. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (ydw, )
May 1, 2015 90 Transcript Acknowledgment/NOTIFICATION received from Court Reporter Risa Entrekin on 77 Notice of Appeal, 11th Circuit Appeal No. 15-10880-B. (ydw)
May 1, 2015 89 NOTICE of Docketing error re 88 Transcript, which is hereby STRICKEN from the record as a docketing error and the parties are instructed to disregard the entry on the court's docket for this case. (kh, )
May 1, 2015 88 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO 89 NOTICE OF DOCKETING ERROR) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING Proceedings (PDF ACCESS RESTRICTED FOR 90 DAYS) held on 9/30/2014, before Judge Wallace Capel, Jr.. Court Reporter/Transcriber Risa L. Entrekin, Telephone number 334-240-2405. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION DUE WITHIN 7 BUSINESS DAYS. Redaction Request due 5/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2015. (kh, ) Modified on 5/1/2015 (kh, ).
May 1, 2015 87 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL MOTION HEARING TRANSCRIPT (PDF ACCESS RESTRICTED FOR 90 DAYS) for dates of 11/20/2015 before Judge HONORABLE WALLACE CAPEL, JR., re 77 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter/Transcriber Risa L. Entrekin, Telephone number (334)240-2405. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION DUE WITHIN 7 BUSINESS DAYS. Redaction Request due 5/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2015. (ydw, )
May 1, 2015 86 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL MOTION HEARING TRANSCRIPT (PDF ACCESS RESTRICTED FOR 90 DAYS) for dates of 09/30/2014 before Judge HONORABLE WALLACE CAPEL, JR., re 77 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter/Transcriber Risa L. Entrekin, Telephone number (334)240-2405. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION DUE WITHIN 7 BUSINESS DAYS. Redaction Request due 5/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2015. (ydw, )
April 21, 2015 85 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 3607.95 against Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (kh, )
April 3, 2015 84 Transcript Acknowledgment received from Court Reporter Risa Entrekin on 15-10880-B for 77 Notice of Appeal. (ydw, )
April 2, 2015 USDC ASSIGNED Court Report Risa Entrekin to transcribe the FTR hearing requested by Attorney re 83 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM regarding 77 Notice of Appeal, 11th Circuit Appeal No. 15-10880-B. No PDF with docket entry. (ydw, )
March 23, 2015 83 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development for proceedings held on 9/30, 2014, 11/20/2014 before Judge Hon. Wallace Capel, Jr, (Kennedy, Gwendolyn)
March 18, 2015 82 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development with following notation: "I am ORDERING A TRANSCRIPT OF THE FOLLLOWING PROCEEDINGS" (PRE-TRIAL) (ydw, )
March 13, 2015 81 BILL OF COSTS by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Routhier, Peter)
March 4, 2015 80 USCA Case Number 15-10880-B for 77 Notice of Appeal filed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (ydw, )
March 2, 2015 79 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 4602035863 re 77 Notice of Appeal filed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development (ydw, )
March 2, 2015 78 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 76 Judgment, 75 Memorandum Opinion and Order, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 77 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 APPEAL PACKAGE) (ydw, )
March 2, 2015 Featured Case NOTICE of Docket Text Correction issued this date re 77 Notice of Appeal to advise that this case was Modified on 3/2/2015, to Create relationship to document # 75 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER and 76 FINAL JUDGMENT entered on 02/09/2015. No PDF with this docket entry. (ydw, )
March 2, 2015 77 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development (Kennedy, Gwendolyn) Modified on 3/2/2015, to Create relationship to document # 75 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER and 76 FINAL JUDGMENT entered on 02/09/2015. (ydw, ).
February 9, 2015 76 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE that judgment is ENTERED in favor of Defendant Target Corporation, and against Plaintiff Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development on all claims. It is further ORDERED that all costs herein incurred are TAXED against Plaintiff, for which let execution issue. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/9/2015. (Furn: ar, calendar)(Term : Final Pretrial Conference 02/19/2015; Jury Trial for 03/23/2015) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(kh, )
February 9, 2015 75 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that Target Corporation's 56 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Further, it is ORDERED that Target Corporation's 26 motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/9/2015. (kh, )
February 6, 2015 74 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Target Corporation re 73 Order to Show Cause,. (Steffen, James)
February 5, 2015 73 Featured Case ORDER that Defendant is DIRECTED to show cause in writing on or before February 6, 2015, at 5:00 p.m., as to why Plaintiff's 72 Amended Jurisdictional Statement should not be adopted. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/5/2015. (kh, )
February 5, 2015 72 AMENDED JURISDICTIONAL STATEMENT by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. . (Kennedy, Gwendolyn) Modified on 2/5/2015 to clarify docket text (kh, ).
January 30, 2015 71 Featured Case ORDERED that on or before 2/6/2015, Plf is DIRECTED to file a Jurisdictional Statement, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/30/2015. (wcl, )
December 1, 2014 70 Featured Case ORDER denying 69 Motion to Show Cause, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/1/2014. (wcl, )
November 21, 2014 Objection to Service re 66 Reply filed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc 69 for pdf) (wcl, )
November 21, 2014 69 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter)(Kennedy, Gwendolyn)
November 20, 2014 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2014 re 62 Second MOTION for Sanctions filed by Target Corporation (PDF available for court use only). (Recording Time 11:05 - 11:34.) (kcf, )
November 17, 2014 Supplement MEMORANDUM in Support re 67 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc 67 for pdf) (wcl, )
November 17, 2014 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re 62 Second MOTION for Sanctions filed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Opposition to Second Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Corporate Representative, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Deposition Testimony)(Kennedy, Gwendolyn)
November 14, 2014 66 REPLY BRIEF re 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Target Corporation. (Routhier, Peter)
November 12, 2014 65 Featured Case ORDERED that Plf shall, on or before 11/17/2014, file a written response to the 62 Second and Renewed Motion for Sanctions and show cause as to why it should not be granted, as further set out in order; ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re 62 Second and Renewed MOTION for Sanctions: Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2014, at 11:00 AM,in Courtroom 5A, before Honorable Judge Wallace Capel Jr., as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/12/2014. (furn: calendar, kf) (wcl, )
November 10, 2014 64 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 62 Second MOTION for Sanctions filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Routhier, Peter)
November 10, 2014 63 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 62 Second MOTION for Sanctions filed by Target Corporation. (Routhier, Peter)
November 10, 2014 62 Second MOTION for Sanctions by Target Corporation. (Routhier, Peter)
November 10, 2014 61 MEMORANDUM in Support re 60 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Plf's Exhibit 1, # 6 Plf's Exhibit 2, # 7 Plf's Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit 5, # 12 Exhibit 6, # 13 Exhibit 7, # 14 Exhibit 8)(wcl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2014: # 15 Corrected Certificate of Service) (wcl, ).
November 7, 2014 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (wcl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2014: # 1 Corrected Certificate of Service) (wcl, ).
October 27, 2014 59 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Peter M. Routhier filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Routhier, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2014: # 16 Certificate of Service) (wcl, ).
October 27, 2014 58 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Stephanie Workman Marrott filed by Target Corporation. (Routhier, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2014: # 1 Certificate of Service) (wcl, ).
October 27, 2014 57 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Target Corporation. (Routhier, Peter)
October 27, 2014 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Target Corporation. (Routhier, Peter)
October 13, 2014 55 Notice of Mediation and Settlement Conference by Target Corporation (Routhier, Peter)
October 11, 2014 54 STATUS REPORT Settlement Conference Report by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (Kennedy, Gwendolyn)
October 7, 2014 53 Featured Case ORDER that Defendant's 45 Second Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as further set out in the order and Defendant's 45 Motion for Sanctions against Plaintiff or its counsel is DENIED without prejudice as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. on 10/7/2014. (dmn, )
October 3, 2014 52 NOTICE by Target Corporation of Joint Proposed Order (Attachments: # 1 (Joint) Proposed Order)(Routhier, Peter)
September 30, 2014 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 9/30/2014 re 45 Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions filed by Target Corporation (PDF available for court use only). (Recording Time 12:31 - 2:37.) (kcf, )
September 29, 2014 50 DECLARATION of Peter M. Routhier regarding Certain Fees and Expenses Incurred in Preparing Defendant Target Corporation's 45 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions. (Routhier, Peter) Modified on 9/30/2014 to reflect actual title and clean up text. (dmn, )
September 29, 2014 49 OPPOSITION to Defendant Target Corporation's 45 Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions filed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2a, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Kennedy, Gwendolyn) Modified on 9/30/2014 to reflect actual title. (dmn, )
September 26, 2014 48 Featured Case ORDER directing Plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE as to why the 45 Second Motion to Compel Discovery and Motion for Sanctions filed by Target Corporation should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 9/29/2014 on or before 9/29/2014. ORDER Setting Hearing on 45 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery and Motion for Sanctions. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2014 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 5A in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge Wallace Capel Jr. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. on 9/26/2014. Copies furnished to calendar group, KG. (dmn, )
September 25, 2014 47 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 45 Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Routhier, Peter) (Attachment(s) added on 9/26/2014 due to being omitted when Affidavit was originally filed: # 10 Certificate of Service) (dmn, ). Modified on 9/26/2014 (dmn, ).
September 25, 2014 46 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 45 Second MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions filed by Target Corporation. (Routhier, Peter)
September 25, 2014 45 Second MOTION to Compel , MOTION for Sanctions by Target Corporation. (Routhier, Peter)
September 24, 2014 44 Featured Case ORDER: Before the court is the parties' 43 Discovery Stipulation, which is construed as a Motion for Extension of the Discovery Deadline. It is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that the deadline in § 7 of the Uniform Scheduling Order (Doc. 24 ) is EXTENDED to and including October 7, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/24/2014. (dmn, )
September 23, 2014 MOTION for Extension of the Discovery Deadline by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development, Target Corporation. (dmn, ) (This document has no pdf attached, see Doc. 43 for pdf.)
September 23, 2014 43 STIPULATION re 24 Scheduling Order, by Target Corporation. (Routhier, Peter)
September 11, 2014 42 Featured Case ORDER granting 37 Motion to Compel, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 9/11/14. (scn, )
September 2, 2014 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re 37 MOTION to Compel filed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (Kennedy, Gwendolyn)
August 25, 2014 40 Featured Case ORDER directing the Plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE as to why the 37 Motion to Compel filed by Target Corporation should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 9/2/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr.on 8/25/2014. (dmn, )
August 22, 2014 39 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 37 MOTION to Compel filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Routhier, Peter)
August 22, 2014 38 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 37 MOTION to Compel filed by Target Corporation. (Routhier, Peter)
August 22, 2014 37 MOTION to Compel by Target Corporation. (Routhier, Peter)
July 30, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER denying 30 Motion to Compel, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/30/2014. (wcl, )
July 29, 2014 35 Reply to response to order to show cause re 32 Order to Show Cause filed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (Kennedy, Gwendolyn) Modified on 7/29/2014 to add the link to the 32 Order (wcl, ).
July 25, 2014 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION to Compel filed by Target Corporation. (Downs, Helen)
July 22, 2014 33 REPLY BRIEF re 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, to the Plaintiff's Opposition to Target's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Target Corporation. (Downs, Helen) Modified on 7/22/2014 to add the link to the 26 Motion (wcl, ).
July 15, 2014 32 Featured Case ORDERED that Dft shall, on or before 7/25/2014, show cause as to why the 30 Motion to Compel should not be granted. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/15/2014. (wcl, )
July 15, 2014 MEMORANDUM of Authorities in Support re 31 Opposition, filed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc 31 -1 for pdf) (wcl, )
July 15, 2014 31 OPPOSITION re 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Authorities in Support)(Kennedy, Gwendolyn) Modified on 7/15/2014 to clarify the docket text and to add the link to the 26 motion (wcl, ).
July 15, 2014 30 MOTION to Compel by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (Kennedy, Gwendolyn)
July 3, 2014 29 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received re 25 Motion: $ 50.00, receipt number 4602032468. (wcl, )
July 2, 2014 28 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/2/2014. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
July 1, 2014 ***Attorney Peter M Routhier for Target Corporation added pursuant to the 25 Motion. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
July 1, 2014 27 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L)(Downs, Helen)
July 1, 2014 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Target Corporation. (Downs, Helen)
July 1, 2014 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Downs, Helen)
March 31, 2014 24 Featured Case UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2015, in Montgomery, AL before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins; Jury Trial set for 3/23/2015, in Montgomery, AL before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins; Dispositive Motions due by 10/27/2014; Mediation Notice due by 11/22/2014; Amended Pleadings due by 4/10/2014; Discovery due by 10/1/2014, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/31/2014. (furn: calendar, ar) (wcl, )
March 25, 2014 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Steffen, James)
March 4, 2014 22 Featured Case GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER setting out briefing schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/4/2014. (dmn, )
March 4, 2014 21 Featured Case RULE 26(F) ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/25/2014. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/4/2014. (dmn, )
February 27, 2014 20 ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by Target Corporation.(Downs, Helen)
February 13, 2014 19 Featured Case ORDER denying 8 Motion for a More Definite Statement. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/13/2014. (wcl, )
February 13, 2014 18 Featured Case ORDERED that based upon Dft's representation that the correct corporate entity is Target Corporation, not Target Stores, Inc. (Doc. # 9 , at n.1), the caption of the complaint is sua sponte AMENDED to reflect that the proper Dft is Target Corporation; The parties are DIRECTED to use Target Corporation for all future submissions to the court, and the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to change the caption accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/13/2014. (wcl, )
January 7, 2014 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Target Stores, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Downs, Helen)
December 27, 2013 16 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 8 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (Kennedy, Gwendolyn) Modified on 12/30/2013 to add link to motion (jg, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2013: # 1 Correct Certificate of Service) (jg, ).
December 12, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER the Motion for Admission of James R. Steffen and Mary Andreleita Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice 11 is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/12/2013. (jg, )
December 12, 2013 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Target Stores, Inc re 12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Downs, Helen)
December 12, 2013 12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Target Stores, Inc. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Conflict Standing Order)(jg, )
December 11, 2013 14 Filing fee received for pro hac admission fees for James Steffen and Mary Andreleita Walker for $100.00, receipt number 4602029318. (jg, )
December 11, 2013 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Target Stores, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Certificates of Good Standing))(Downs, Helen)
December 6, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER that Plf shall file a response to the 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement on or before 12/30/2013; Dft may file a reply on or before 1/7/2014, as further set out in order; Motion Submission Deadline set for 1/7/2014. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/6/2013. (wcl, )
November 27, 2013 ***Attorney James R Steffen and Leita Walker for Target Stores, Inc added pursuant to 8 motion. (No pdf for this docket entry) (jg, )
November 27, 2013 9 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement Target Stores, Inc. (Downs, Helen) Modified on 12/2/2013 to correct the filer's name (jg, ).
November 27, 2013 8 MOTION for More Definite Statement Target Stores, Inc. (Downs, Helen) Modified on 12/2/2013 to correct the filer's name (jg, ).
November 14, 2013 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. Target Stores, Inc served on 11/8/2013, answer due 11/29/2013. (dmn, )
November 12, 2013 6 NOTICE of Non-Compliance re 4 Interrogatories Propounded: The referenced document was electronically filed on 11/8/2013 in this case and is not in compliance with the local rules and/or administrative procedures of this court. (Attachments: # 1 Local Rule 26.3)(jg, )
November 8, 2013 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Target Stores, Inc filed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Gwendolyn) Modified on 11/12/2013 to correct defendant's name (jg, ).
November 8, 2013 4 STRICKEN AS DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 26.3 NON-FILING OF CIVIL DISCOVERY: INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Defendants by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development.(Kennedy, Gwendolyn) Modified on 11/12/2013 (jg, ).
November 6, 2013 3 Summons Issued and returned to counsel for personal service as to Target Stores. (jg, )
November 6, 2013 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (jg, )
November 6, 2013 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. See 1 complaint for this docket entry. (No pdf for this entry) (jg, )
November 6, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Target Stores (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 4602028959.), filed by Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development v. Target Stores, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa and Raymond Parks Institute for Self Development
Represented By: Gwendolyn Thomas Kennedy(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Stores, Inc
Represented By: Helen Kathryn Downs
Represented By: James R Steffen(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Mary Andreleita Walker(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?