White v. United States of America (INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: John Edward White
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2013cv00917
Filed: December 13, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that the 13 Recommendation be and is hereby ADOPTED and that the motion to vacate sentence filed by dft John Edward White be and is hereby DENIED and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/25/2014. (wcl, )
December 23, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Mr. White should therefore inform the court, on or before January 10, 2014, of his wishes to do one of the following: (1) continue to proceed before this court (under 28 U.S.C. § 2255) on the claims he has presented in his motion 1 ; or (2) amend his motion to assert any additional claims that he wishes to assert in challenging his conviction and/or sentence; or (3) withdraw his motion as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/23/2013. (jg, )
December 18, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before January 10, 2014, White shall inform this court whether he seeks to do one of the following: (1) have his motion 1 construed as a § 2255 motion as further set out; (2) amend his motion to assert any additional claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255 as further set out; (3) withdraw his motion. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/18/2013. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Susan R. Redmond(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Edward White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?