Twyman v. Thomas et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Robert Twyman, Jr.
Defendant: Jacob Argo, Kim Tobias Thomas and Alabama Department of Corrections Central Records
Case Number: 2:2014cv00010
Filed: January 2, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 motion to proceed with complaint, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/14/14. (scn, )
March 5, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon an independent evaluation and de novo review of the file in this case, the court finds the Plaintiff's objection to be without merit, and it is hereby ORDERED as follows: (1) The the extent that the objection may be in terpreted as an objection to the Magistrate Judge's order denying the Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, the court finds the order to be neither clearly erroneous nor contrary to law, and the objection is OVERRULED; (2) The P laintiff's objection to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is OVERRULED; (3) The court ADOPTS the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for the Plaintiff's failure to pay the full filing fee upon the initiation of this case. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 3/5/14. (scn, )
January 27, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by the plaintiff 2 be and is hereby DENIED; that this case be dismissed without prejudice for the plaintiffs failure to pay the full filing fee upon the initiation of this case; Objections to R&R due by 2/10/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 1/27/2014. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twyman v. Thomas et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Argo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Tobias Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections Central Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Twyman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?