Ellison v. The Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Wilbur Lee Ellison
Defendant: The Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles
Case Number: 2:2014cv00885
Filed: August 20, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2015 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING the plf's 114 Objection to the US Magistrate Judge's 113 order, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/6/15. (djy, )
July 23, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING the 109 objection, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/23/15. (djy, )
November 6, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) the 31 Objection is overruled; (2) plf must file an amended complaint on or before 11/27/2014; (3) this case is referred back to the magistrate judge for additional proceedings, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/6/14. (djy, )
October 14, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that (1) plf's 24 & 25 objections are overruled; and (2) and this case is referred back to the magistrate judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/14/2014. (wcl, )
October 10, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, after an independent and de novo review of the entire record, it is ORDERED that (1) plaintiff's 10 objections are overruled; and (2) and this case is referred back to the magistrate judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/10/14. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellison v. The Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbur Lee Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?