Boyd v. Thomas et al (DEATH PENALTY)

Plaintiff: Anthony Boyd
Defendant: Kim T. Thomas, Walter Myers and Luther Strange
Case Number: 2:2014cv01017
Filed: October 2, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Boyd's Rule 59 motion (Doc. # 52 ) is DENIED, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/6/2015. (kh, ) .
November 2, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Defendants shall show cause, in writing, on or before November 9, 2015, why Plaintiff's 52 Motion to Vacate Judgment should not be granted. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/2/2015. (kh, )
October 7, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1. Boyd's 45 motion for leave to file second amended complaint is DENIED. 2. The State's 39 renewed motion to dismiss is GRANTED. A separate final judgment is forthcoming. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/7/2015. (kh, )
March 19, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: 1. This proceeding is STAYED generally. 2. Within fourteen (14) days from the Supreme Court's decision in Glossip, the parties shall jointly, if possible, or individually, if not, file a statement or appropriate motion that i nforms the court of their respective positions on the issues in this case in view of the Glossip decision. 3. The State's 23 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED with LEAVE to REFILE following the Supreme Court's decision in Glossip. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/19/2015. (kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Thomas et al (DEATH PENALTY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Boyd
Represented By: William M. Dunham
Represented By: Jennifer L. Ioli
Represented By: John C. La Liberte
Represented By: Matthew C. Moschella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim T. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?