Thomason v. State of Alabama Home Builders Licensure Board (JOINT ASSIGN)(MAG+)

Plaintiff: Steven Clayton Thomason
Defendant: State of Alabama Home Builders Licensure Board
Case Number: 2:2015cv00026
Filed: January 13, 2015
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2017 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiff's motion to vacate the judgment pursuant to Rule 59(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Doc. # 122 ) is DENIED. 2. Plaintiff's motion to vacate the judgment pursuant to Rule 60(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Doc. # 122 ) is DENIED. 3. Plaintiff's motion to vacate the judgment pursuant to Rule 60(d)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Doc. # 122 ) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/24/2017. (kh, )
March 24, 2017 120 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiff Steven Clayton Thomason's objection (Doc. # 116 ) is OVERRULED. 2. The Recommendation (Doc. # 114 ) is ADOPTED. 3. Plaintiff's motion for injunction (Doc. # 83 ) is DEN IED. 4. Defendants' motion to renew their motions to dismiss (Doc. # 89 ) is GRANTED, and the motions to dismiss (Doc. ## 10 , 18 , 35 , 37 , and 38 ) and motions for more definite statement (Doc. ## 35 , 37 , 38 ) are renewed. 5. The m otion to dismiss (Doc. # 10 ) filed by Defendants State of Alabama Home Builders Licensure Board, and J. R. Carden, Jr., Jamie Durham, Stephen McCollough, Todd Betts, and Kathy Perry Brasfield is GRANTED. 6. The motion to dismiss (Doc. # 18 ) filed by Defendants Daryl Bailey, Todd Betts, Kathy Perry Brasfield, J.R. Carden, Jamie A. Durham, Stephen McCollough is GRANTED. 7. The motion to dismiss (Doc. # 35 ) filed by Defendants Alabama Home Builders Licensure Board, J. R. Carden, Kathy Perry B rasfield, Jamie A. Durham, Todd Betts, Stephen McCollough, and Daryl Bailey is GRANTED. 8. The motion for more definite statement (Doc. # 35 ) filed by Defendants Alabama Home Builders Licensure Board, J. R. Carden, Kathy Perry Brasfield, Jamie A. D urham, Todd Betts, Stephen McCollough, and Daryl Bailey is DENIED as moot. 9. The motion to dismiss (Doc. # 37 ) filed by Defendants Steve Marshall, Lynn Corder, Jack B. Reid, and Ken Kirchler is GRANTED. 10. The motion for more definite statement ( Doc. # 37 ) filed by Defendants Steve Marshall, Lynn Corder, Jack B. Reid, and Ken Kirchler is DENIED as moot. 11. The motion to dismiss (Doc. # 38 ) filed by Defendants William R. DeLoney, Don Spurlin, Randy Cunningham, John T. Manuel, and Roddy O . Sample is GRANTED. 12. The motion for more definite statement (Doc. # 38 ) filed by Defendants William R. DeLoney, Don Spurlin, Randy Cunningham, John T. Manuel, and Roddy O. Sample is DENIED as moot. 13. Plaintiff Steven Clayton Thomason's c laims against Defendants State of Alabama Home Builders Licensure Board, J. R. Carden, Kathy Perry Brasfield, Jamie A. Durham, Stephen McCollough, Todd Betts, Daryl Bailey, Steve Marshall, William R. Deloney, Don Spurlin, Lynn Corder, Randy Cunningha m, Ken Kirchier, John T. Manuel, Jack B. Reid, and Ruddy O. Sample are DISMISSED with prejudice.14. There being no other claims pending, this case is DISMISSED. Final judgment will be entered separately. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/24/2017. (kh, )
June 20, 2016 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff's motion for permission to appeal (Doc. # 92 ) is DENIED. 2. Plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis (Doc. # 93 ) is DENIED as moot. 3. Plaintiff's motion to consolidate (Doc. # 92 ) is DENIED. 4. This case is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings in accordance 28 U.S.C. § 636. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/20/2016. (kh, )
June 25, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as follows: 1. Mr. Steven Clayton Thomason's 21 Objection is OVERRULED. 2. The 20 Recommendation is ADOPTED. 3. Mr. Steven Clayton Thomason's Motions to Remand (Docs. 4 , 7 ) are DENIED as further set out in the order. 4. This case is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings in accordance 28 U.S.C. § 636. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/25/2015. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomason v. State of Alabama Home Builders Licensure Board (JOINT ASSIGN)(MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Clayton Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama Home Builders Licensure Board
Represented By: Kathy Perry Brasfield
Represented By: Jamie Ayers Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?