United States of America v. State of Alabama, et al.
Plaintiff: |
United States of America |
Defendant: |
State of Alabama and Alabama Department of Corrections |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00368 |
Filed: |
May 28, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Montgomery Office |
County: |
Montgomery |
Presiding Judge: |
Terry F. Moorer |
Presiding Judge: |
Myron H. Thompson |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1997 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 13, 2022 |
Filing
66
ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties are to meet, and, after receiving input from the monitor, submit to the court by 4/26/2022, a joint proposal for the timely resolution of the issue of compliance with § III.C.1.i.1 of the consent decree ( Doc. 11 ) that has been pending since 2015, including what steps to take, how to involve those needed for timely resolution (in particular, APOSTC), and how to involve them. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/13/2022. (amf, )
|
March 29, 2022 |
Filing
64
ORDER: it is ORDERED that: (1) Another status conference is set for 9/16/2022, at 9:00 a.m., by videoconferencing. The clerk of the court is to make appropriate arrangements. (2) On or before 9/9/2022, the parties are to file a statement, separa tely or jointly, as to the status of the consent decree. In the report(s), the parties should also update the court on how they are progressing with regard to the benchmark deadlines discussed in their most recent joint status report (Doc. 62 ). It is further ORDERED that the parties, with input from the Monitor, are to file, on or before 4/4/2022, a joint statement defining the APOSTC issue. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/29/2022. (furn: calendar, ag, videoconference) (cwl, )
|
September 30, 2021 |
Filing
60
ORDER: it is ORDERED that: (1) Another status conference is set for 3/28/2022, at 9:00 a.m., by videoconferencing. The clerk of the court is to make appropriate arrangements. (2) On or before 3/21/2022, the parties are to file a statement, separately or jointly, as to the status of the consent decree, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/30/2021. (furn: calendar, ag, videoconference) (cwl, )
|
October 1, 2020 |
Filing
50
ORDER: it is ORDERED that another status conference is set for 9/29/2021, at 10:00 AM, by videoconferencing; The Clerk is to make appropriate arrangements; On or before 9/24/2021, the parties are instructed to file a joint report explaining their understanding of the current status of the understaffing issue. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/1/2020. (Furnished: Calendar & AG) (amf, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?