Williams v. American International Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Fredrick R. Williams
Defendant: American International Group, Inc., AIG Claims, Inc., Chartis Claims, Inc., Health Direct, Inc. and American Home Assurance Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00554
Filed: August 3, 2015
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Joint Motion to Compel, as further set out in order; Plf is further ORDERED to execute the consent form attached to Dfts' motion (Doc. 45 -2) and provide a copy of the fully executed form to counsel for each dft within seven days from the date of this Order; Dfts are ORDERED to produce to Plf a copy of all documents obtained from the Social Security Administration within seven days of receipt and at Dfts' expense. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 6/21/2016. (wcl, )
June 3, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' 33 Motion to Reconsider is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Leave to Take Additional Deposition is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 6/3/2016. (dmn, )
May 12, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Plf's 21 Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part, DENIED in part, and rendered MOOT in part, as further set out in order; Dfts shall provide all supplemental responses ordered herein within seven days of this Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 5/12/2016. (wcl, )
May 2, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Increase Depositions Allowed to the Plaintiff Under the Discovery Plan is GRANTED in part, as further set out in the order. The Motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 5/2/2016. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. American International Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick R. Williams
Represented By: Frank Howard Hawthorne, Jr.
Represented By: Randle Al Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Claims, Inc.
Represented By: John William Dodson
Represented By: Michael Hagel Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chartis Claims, Inc.
Represented By: John William Dodson
Represented By: Michael Hagel Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Direct, Inc.
Represented By: Aziz David Fawal
Represented By: Katherine T. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Co., Inc.
Represented By: John William Dodson
Represented By: Michael Hagel Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?