Belcher et al v. The Grand Reserve MGM, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kimberly Belcher, Dedric Belcher, A.S., L.B. and A.C.
Defendant: The Grand Reserve MGM, LLC and The Grand Reserve Pike Road
Case Number: 2:2015cv00834
Filed: November 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the Court denies Plaintiffs' 143 MOTION to Alter, Amend, or Vacate, as further set out in order; the Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' 147 MOTION to Tax Costs to Plaintiff; The Court d enies the motion with respect to $50.00 of fees for condensed transcripts, but the Court grants the motion in all other respects; The Court hereby awards Defendants costs in the amount of $4,600.76. Signed by Honorable Judge Keith Starrett on 2/6/2019. (kr, )
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: the Court finds as follows: 1) Plfs presented no credible evidence of racial discrimination, 2) Plfs' claims of familial discrimination fail because Dfts were responding to legitimate safety concerns, 3) Dfts did not retaliate against Plfs, and 4) Dfts did not substantially interfere with Plfs' use or enjoyment of the subject property; The Court will enter a separate final judgment in favor of Dfts. Signed by Honorable Judge Keith Starrett on 9/25/2018. (wcl, )
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING 46 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. Plaintiffs' 38 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and subsequent injunctive requests (Docs. 38 , 43 ) are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/10/2016. (dmn, )
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiffs' 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED as further set out in the order. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 2 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings and a recommendation. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/6/2015. (dmn, ) Modified on 11/6/2015 to reflect Chief Judge Watkins as the judge signing the order. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belcher et al v. The Grand Reserve MGM, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Belcher
Represented By: James E. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dedric Belcher
Represented By: James E. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.S.
Represented By: James E. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.B.
Represented By: James E. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.C.
Represented By: James E. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Grand Reserve MGM, LLC
Represented By: Emily Coody Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Grand Reserve Pike Road
Represented By: Emily Coody Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?