Smith v. The Montgomery Police Department et al(MAG+)
Plaintiff: |
Peter James Smith |
Defendant: |
The Montgomery Police Department, Todd Strange, Christopher Murphy, Daryl D. Bailey, Lionel Finley and The City of Montgomery, Alabama |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00156 |
Filed: |
March 9, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Montgomery Office |
County: |
Macon |
Presiding Judge: |
Gray M. Borden |
Presiding Judge: |
William Keith Watkins |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 3, 2017 |
Filing
25
ORDER as follows: 1. The 24 Recommendation is ADOPTED. 2. The claims of Plaintiff Peter James Smith against Defendants Montgomery Police Department, Todd Strange, Christopher Murphy, Ernest N. Finley, Jr., and the City of Montgomery, Alabama, are D ISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b). The court specifically finds that Plaintiff Peter J. Smith has established a clear record of failing to comply with court orders. Further, because lesser sanctions than dismissal and numerous accommod ations have failed to gain Plaintiffs compliance with court orders and deadlines, the court finds that lesser sanctions than dismissal are insufficient. A separate final judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/3/2017. (dmn, )
|
December 23, 2016 |
Filing
15
ORDERED that the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge (Doc. # 10 ) is ADOPTED IN PART and REJECTED IN PART as follows: 1. Smith's claims against all Defendants for violation of 18 U.S.C. § 249 are DISMISSED with prejudice. 2. Smith' s claims against Defendant Daryl D. Bailey are DISMISSED with prejudice, and Defendant Bailey is DISMISSED from this action. 3. To the extent that Smith is attempting to state a claim against any Defendant for an arrest in violation of the constituti onal protection against double jeopardy, his double jeopardy claims against all Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. 4. Smiths HIPAA claim is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all Defendants. 5. At this time, because some federal claims remain pendi ng, the court will not dismiss Smith's state law claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(3). 6. On or before January 18, 2017, Smith shall file an amended complaint against Defendants Strange, Murphy, and Finley in their individual capacitie s;2 the City of Montgomery; and the Montgomery Police Department. ORDERED that this case, including the motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. # 4 ), is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial mattersas may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/23/2016. (kh, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?