Slater v. Woods et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Demon Victorell Slater
Defendant: Lt. Woods, Jefferson S. Dunn, Robert Bentley, Captain Lawson, Walter Myers and Patrice Richie
Case Number: 2:2016cv00215
Filed: March 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER directing that: (1) the 72 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; (2) this case is DISMISSED without prejudice as the plf's claims for relief are moot. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/9/17. (djy, )
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: It is ORDERED that: 1. The 58 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED 2. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice for the Plaintiffs failure to comply with the orders of this court resulting in his failure to properly prosecute this action. Final Judgment will be entered separately. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 2/23/2017. (dmn, )
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: This case is before the court on the 37 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge and the Plaintiff's "Notice of Appeal" (Doc. 41 ), which the court treats as an objection to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. It is her eby ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiff's objection is OVERRULED. 2. The court ADOPTS the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. 3. Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 30 ) is DENIED. 4. This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/22/2016. (dmn, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slater v. Woods et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demon Victorell Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Represented By: Katherine S Jessip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bentley
Represented By: Katherine S Jessip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Lawson
Represented By: Katherine S Jessip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Myers
Represented By: Katherine S Jessip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Richie
Represented By: Katherine S Jessip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?