Akridge v. Alfa Insurance Companies

Plaintiff: Jennifer Akridge
Defendant: Alfa Insurance Companies
Case Number: 2:2017cv00372
Filed: June 9, 2017
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Gray M. Borden
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2018 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 71 Motion to Amend and 82 Motion to Strike, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 9/4/18. (djy, )
August 28, 2018 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1) The Plf's 74 Motion to Stay Proceedings During Pendency of Review by the Eleventh Circuit of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and 79 Renewed Motion for Stay are DENIED as moot; 2) The Dft has until 9/5/2018 to SHOW CAUSE why the Plf's 79 alternative motion for an extended time period in which to respond to the pending 76 Motion for Summary Judgment ought not be granted. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 8/28/2018. (alm, )
July 30, 2018 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1) Akridge's 62 Renewed Motion for Court to Order Dft Alfa to Produce Scott Forest as Deponent Witness or in the Alternative Motion to Certify Question for Interlocutory Appeal is DENIED; 2) Th e 67 Motion to Reopen and Extend the Expert Witness Disclosure Date, which appears only to refer to an affidavit offered in support of the renewed motion seeking the deposition of Scott Forest, is DENIED; 3) The 66 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 7/30/2018. (alm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akridge v. Alfa Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Akridge
Represented By: Chase Elliot Estes
Represented By: Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Insurance Companies
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?