Crenshaw v. Baggett et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Lamarcus Murice Crenshaw
Defendant: Angie Baggett, C. Wright and Ms. Lawson
Case Number: 2:2017cv00631
Filed: September 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT: ORDERED as follows: (1) The recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge (doc. no. #13 ) is adopted. (2) This lawsuit is dismissed without prejudice as moot, with no costs taxed. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(kh, ) Modified on 2/26/2018 (kh, ).
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION: Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/26/2018. (kh, ) Modified on 2/26/2018 (kh, ).
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order No objections filed to the #13 Recommendation. (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice as moot. Objections to R&R due by 2/12/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 1/25/2018. (kh, )
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Angie Baggett, Ms. Lawson, C. Wright (no pdf document attached to this entry)(kh, )
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED that on or before January 12, 2018 the plaintiff shall file a response to the written report filed by the defendants addressing each of the arguments/defenses raised therein. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/13/2017. (kh, )
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Answer and Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint , ANSWER to Amendment to Complaint by Angie Baggett, Ms. Lawson, C. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Angie Baggett, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Angela Lawson, #3 Exhibit C Affidavit of Charlotte Wright)(Goldthwaite, Mary)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint, amendment and order of procedure signed by Belinda Spencer for Angie Baggett served on 11/3/2017, answer due 12/12/2017. (djy, )
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint, amendment and order of procedure signed by Belinda Spencer for Ms. Lawson served on 11/3/2017, answer due 12/12/2017. (djy, )
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint, #5 amendment to the complaint, #7 order signed by E.Howard for C. Wright served on 11/2/2017, answer due 12/12/2017. (kh, )
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT and ANSWER on or before 12/12/2017, as further set out in order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint and amendment to named defendants; mailed with complaint and amendment to Gen Counsel for the ADOC. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/31/17. (djy, )
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON MOTION granting #5 Motion for Leave to amend the complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/31/17. (djy, )
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT against Angie Baggett, Ms. Lawson, C. Wright, filed by Lamarcus Murice Crenshaw. Related document: #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Lamarcus Murice Crenshaw (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See docket entry #5 ).(djy, )
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to To Amend The Complaint/Supplement by Lamarcus Murice Crenshaw. (kh, )
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 10/25/2017 the plf shall file an amendment to his complaint in which he identifies (i) the false information on which the dfts have relied to classify him as a restricted offender, and (ii) the constitutional basis for his equal protection claim, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/10/2017. (wcl, )
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 4602046951 (kh, )
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED that on or before October 10, 2017 the plaintiff shall file either the appropriate affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a prison account statement from the account clerk at Bullock showing the average monthly balance in plaintiff's prison account for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of this complaint and the average monthly deposits to plaintiff's account during the past six months or, if he does not seek in forma pauperis treatment, the $400 filing/administrative fees. To aid the plaintiff in complying with this order, the CLERK is DIRECTED to furnish him with a copy of the form affidavit used by persons seeking to proceed in forma pauperis before this court. The plaintiff is cautioned that if he fails to comply with this order the Magistrate Judge will recommend that this case be dismissed. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/25/2017. (kh, )
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Angie Baggett, Ms. Lawson, C. Wright, filed by Lamarcus Murice Crenshaw. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (No filing fee; No IFP)(kr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crenshaw v. Baggett et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Baggett
Represented By: Mary Arrington Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Wright
Represented By: Mary Arrington Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Lawson
Represented By: Mary Arrington Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamarcus Murice Crenshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?