The State of Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al (JOINT ASSIGN) Featured Case

Plaintiff: The State of Alabama
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. and Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00089
Filed: February 6, 2018
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2018 Case transferred to Northern District of Ohio; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
February 27, 2018 6 Received certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 2/26/2018 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to USDC for the Northern District of Ohio. (wcl, )
February 16, 2018 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint for Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 2/12/2018, answer due 3/5/2018. (dmn, )
February 16, 2018 4 Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by William Lolley for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 2/13/2018, answer due 3/6/2018. (dmn, )
February 8, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc..; mailed CMRRR with copy of 1 Complaint and 2 Conflict Disclosure Statement. (wcl, )
February 6, 2018 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The State of Alabama. (wcl, )
February 6, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The State of Alabama. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc 1 for pdf) (wcl, )
February 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602048286.), filed by The State of Alabama. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The State of Alabama v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al (JOINT ASSIGN)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Alabama
Represented By: Jere Locke Beasley
Represented By: Michael G. Dean
Represented By: Joshua Patrick Hayes
Represented By: Rhon Eugene Jones
Represented By: Jon Ryan Kral
Represented By: Corey Landon Maze
Represented By: Robert Franklin Prince
Represented By: Winfield James Sinclair
Represented By: Richard Douglas Stratton
Represented By: William Robert Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?