Powell v. AmSher Collection Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Latoya Powell
Defendant: AmSher Collection Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00674
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGMENT: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this cause is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice and with the parties to bear their own costs; DIRECTING the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(alm, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (djy, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 11 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal by Latoya Powell, Amsher Collection Services, Inc.. (McDaniel, Reginald) Modified on 9/13/2018 to clarify text to reflect as JOINT also filed on behalf of AmSher Collection Services, Inc. (qc/djy, ).
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/11/2018; DIRECTING counsel for the parties to complete and to send to the Clerk the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 9/11/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 8/21/2018. (alm, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Assignment to US Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for AmSher Collection Services, Inc. (alm, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by AmSher Collection Services, Inc.. (Nettles, Laura)
August 13, 2018 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AmSher Collection Services, Inc..(Nettles, Laura)
July 27, 2018 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and #1 Complaint signed by A. Strawn for AmSher Collection Services, Inc. served on 7/25/2018, answer due 8/15/2018. (wcl, )
July 24, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Latoya Powell re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (McDaniel, Reginald) Modified on 7/25/2018 (wcl, ).
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AmSher Collection Services, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of #1 Complaint. (wcl, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Latoya Powell; Corporate Disclosures due by 8/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment) (wcl, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Latoya Powell. (wcl, )
July 19, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Latoya Powell. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AmSher Collection Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602050066.), filed by Latoya Powell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. AmSher Collection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Powell
Represented By: Reginald Daryl McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmSher Collection Services, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Catherine Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?